Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe de Morlet

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornNivelles, Belgium
21 Sep 161424.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 163242.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
26 Sep 163242.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
25 Dec 163343.9DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christophe de Morlet:
Bishop Christophe de Morlet (died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

  • a priest for 19.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015