Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Varela Fondevilla y Verea

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1721BornSan Pedro de Folladella
20 Nov 176948.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
20 Nov 176948.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
4 Feb 177048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
11 Apr 178563.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Varela Fondevilla y Verea:
Bishop Juan Varela Fondevilla y Verea (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 87, Number 440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013