Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Tomás Menéndez Luarca y Queipo de Llano

Deceased

Bishop of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1743³Born
25 Jun 178440.5AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
5 Sep 178440.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
20 Jun 181975.5DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Tomás Menéndez Luarca y Queipo de Llano
Bishop Rafael Tomás Menéndez Luarca y Queipo de Llano (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSetienes

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 101, Number 524
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast