Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolás Castells, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Other

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis

Apostolic Administrator of Baghdad

Titular See: (Mesopotamia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1799BornBarcelona, Spain
19 Jun 186666.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
19 Jun 186666.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Baghdad, Iraq
9 Sep 186666.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
23 Nov 186667.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Other
7 Sep 187373.8DiedApostolic Delegate to Other

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Castells:
Archbishop Nicolás Castells O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Other

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 137, and Page 365
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 173, Number 953

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015