Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Javier Uriz Lasaga

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1747³BornSada de Sangüesa
4 Sep 181568.2AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
15 Oct 181568.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
17 Aug 182982.2DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Javier Uriz Lasaga:
Bishop Joaquín Javier Uriz Lasaga (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 132, Number 708

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015