Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Raimundo Santos Larumbe y Larrayoz

Deceased

Bishop of Tudela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1748BornPamplona
14 Apr 181768.5AppointedBishop of Tudela, Spain
31 Aug 181768.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tudela, Spain
3 Oct 181869.9DiedBishop of Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Raimundo Santos Larumbe y Larrayoz:
Bishop Juan Raimundo Santos Larumbe y Larrayoz (born , died ) Bishop of Tudela

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013