Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Liu Zhong-yu (Liu Zongyu)

Deceased

Bishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1916Born
1945²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 198165.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China
30 Sep 199275.8DiedBishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Liu Zhong-yu (Liu Zongyu)
Bishop Simon Liu Zhong-yu (Liu Zongyu) (born , died ) Bishop of Chongqing [Chungking]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDazu County, Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
Ordained BishopChungking, Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,097
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast