Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Michał Trzciński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Iuliopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1684³BornStararauen
22 Jul 170823.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno, Poland
25 Jul 170823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
21 Jul 173247.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
21 Jul 173247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
19 Oct 173248.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
3 Jan 173853.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Michał Trzciński:
Bishop Józef Michał Trzciński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015