Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Tosi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Punjab

Titular Bishop of Rhodiapolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1826BornCesena, Italy
3 Mar 186841.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
3 Mar 186841.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
28 Jun 186842.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
27 Sep 188054.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Punjab, India
1886¹59.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Punjab, India
3 Jun 190175.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Punjab, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Tosi:
Bishop Paul Tosi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Punjab

  • a bishop for 32.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013