Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Tong Changping

Bishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Weinan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1968 Born
6 Jan 199728.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 200233.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China
17 Jan 200435.1InstalledBishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Tong Changping
Bishop Joseph Tong Changping (born ) Bishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow]

Please contact the Bishop through the Prefecture Apostolic of Tongzhou [Tungchow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 7 Jan 2021

Quantcast