Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)

Tiruvallensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archeparchy
  • Elevated: 15 May 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Syro-Malankarese Catholic Church of the Antiochian Tradition
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 11,120 (4,295 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.tiruvallaarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Archbishop's House, P.B. 4, Marygiri, Thiruvalla-689101, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0469)2701.319
  • Fax: 2600.822

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)
11 June 1932ErectedEparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
28 October 1978Territory LostEparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
15 January 2003Territory LostEparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)
15 May 2006ElevatedEparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese) Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)
195015,0001,558,0001.0%60107021454569ap1951
196933,03818,777,340.2%108171252643312964ap1971
197833,5001011811928131180151ap1981
199043,0001,433,0003.0%1034514829074274168ap1991
199955,94514,552,328.4%1213315436357291184ap2000
200056,40014,785,000.4%1233315636157351185ap2001
200156,90013,041,300.4%1213415536759348185ap2002
200256,17613,145,970.4%1305518530387306187ap2003
200336,1275,276,306.7%953513027770436126ap2004
200436,6735,277,300.7%923813028238250130ap2005
Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)
200937,7935,479,000.7%1072513228654290133ap2010
201037,4865,555,000.7%1122513727354307133ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 May 2013