Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Licht y Barrera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1699³Born
25 Jan 174545.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
25 Apr 174546.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
17 Jan 175050.7ResignedBishop of Guadix, Spain
5 Jan 175151.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Licht y Barrera
Bishop Andrés Licht y Barrera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 63, Number 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast