Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Fonda

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Trał)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1686BornPirano
25 May 170923.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 173346.7AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1 Feb 173346.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
5 May 173852.0AppointedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia
30 Nov 175468.6DiedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Fonda:
Bishop Gerolamo Fonda (died ) Bishop of Trogir (Trał)

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 313, and Page 411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013