Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Sansedoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1551BornSienne
15 Jun 157726.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 160655.6AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
26 Nov 160655.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
1611¹59.7ResignedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
19 Dec 162574.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Sansedoni:
Bishop Giulio Sansedoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 43, Number 230
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 197
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 43, Number 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015