Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Drašković

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateEventTitle
1623²Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 1629AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
24 Feb 1630Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Oct 1630SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
22 Oct 1635SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1650¹DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Drašković:
Bishop György Drašković (died 1650) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 207, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 356, and Page 378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015