Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Pablo Tenreiro Francia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guanare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1900BornCaracas
31 Mar 192322.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 193939.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
30 Aug 193939.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
10 Dec 193939.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
23 Oct 195454.3AppointedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
11 Nov 196565.3ResignedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
11 Nov 196565.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
19 Jan 197170.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
20 Feb 198382.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Guanare, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pablo Tenreiro Francia:
Bishop Pedro Pablo Tenreiro Francia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guanare

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015