Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton von Zehmen

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1715Born
7 Jun 174529.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eichstätt, Germany
12 Jun 174529.5Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Mar 178165.3SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
17 Sep 178165.8ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
25 Nov 178166.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Jun 179074.5DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton von Zehmen
Bishop Johann Anton von Zehmen (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWahrberg

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast