Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomuk August Ungelter von Deisenhausen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1731³BornHöchstädt
25 Jul 175524.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
26 Jul 175524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
12 Jul 177948.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
12 Jul 177948.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
29 Aug 177948.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
26 Jan 180472.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomuk August Ungelter von Deisenhausen
Bishop Johann Nepomuk August Ungelter von Deisenhausen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 332, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016