Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton von Freyberg-Hopferau

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1674BornHopferau
14 Mar 169924.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
6 Sep 169925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
5 Dec 173662.3SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
7 Jun 173762.8ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
8 Sep 173763.1Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
20 Apr 175782.7DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton von Freyberg-Hopferau:
Bishop Johann Anton von Freyberg-Hopferau (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212
  • c34: ATh, 29 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016