Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver von Adelmann von Adelmannsfelden

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Mactaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1721BornHohenstadt
17 Sep 174726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
25 May 175028.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
25 May 175028.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
9 Aug 175029.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
17 Oct 178766.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver von Adelmann von Adelmannsfelden:
Bishop Franz Xaver von Adelmann von Adelmannsfelden (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013