Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Spinola, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Savona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1592³Born
29 Apr 162431.6AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
19 May 162431.6Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
8 Aug 166471.9DiedBishop of Savona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Spinola:
Bishop Francesco Maria Spinola C.R. (died ) Bishop of Savona

  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 84, Number 502

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013