Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Donghi, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
18 Apr 164434.2AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
15 May 164434.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
28 Jan 1648³38.0DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Donghi
Bishop Augustin Donghi C.R. (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Aleria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Italy
Ordained BishopSant'Andrea della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 7
  • c3+: AT, 21 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast