Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignazio Cardinal Nasalli-Ratti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1750BornParma, Italy
24 Sep 177423.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 181969.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
19 Dec 181969.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
21 Jan 182069.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
25 Jun 182776.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 182776.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
17 Sep 182776.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
2 Dec 183181.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Nasalli-Ratti
Ignazio Cardinal Nasalli-Ratti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Switzerland

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 75
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 Jun 1827

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016