Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John of Oxford

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1175AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
14 Dec 1175Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
2 Jun 1200DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John of Oxford
Bishop John of Oxford (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 49
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast