Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Glanville

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1185AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 1185Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 1214DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Glanville:
Bishop Gilbert Glanville (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 50
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 559

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014