Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfrey de Lucy

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1189AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
22 Oct 1189Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
11 Sep 1204DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Godfrey de Lucy:
Bishop Godfrey de Lucy (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 51
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014