Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Savaric FitzGeldewin

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1192¹AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 1192Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 1192Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
8 Aug 1205DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Savaric FitzGeldewin
Bishop Savaric FitzGeldewin (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a priest for 12.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 51
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast