Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Duvoisin

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1744Born
13 Jul 180257.7SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
25 Jul 180257.7ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
1 Aug 180257.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
9 Jul 181368.7DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Duvoisin
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Duvoisin (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangres

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast