Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Shu Qi-shui (Chou Ki wei)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1958SelectedBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
26 Apr 1960Ordained BishopBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
1983²DiedBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Shu Qi-shui (Chou Ki wei)
Bishop Shu Qi-shui (Chou Ki wei) (died 1983) Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 28
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast