Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Domenico de’ Marini

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1611AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
1 May 1611Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
18 Jul 1616AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
15 Nov 1627AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
Feb 1635DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico de’ Marini
Patriarch Domenico de’ Marini (died Feb 1635) Archbishop of Genova

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Diocese of Perugia

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1611, Number 12
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,405
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast