Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Schirò

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1846Born
30 Jul 188943.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
18 Aug 188943.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
29 Nov 189549.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
1 Aug 192781.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Schirò
Archbishop Giuseppe Schirò (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceContessa Entellina, Archdiocese of Monreale, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas des Grecs, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 279, and Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017