Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Musotti

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535¹Born
9 Dec 157944.9AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
25 Feb 158045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
22 Dec 159156.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
26 Feb 159358.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
23 Jan 160772.0DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Musotti
Bishop Alessandro Musotti (born 1535, died ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna

  • a bishop for 26.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast