Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ercole Tassoni

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jul 1596AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
25 Aug 1596Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
17 Dec 1597DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Ercole Tassoni
Patriarch Ercole Tassoni (died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 162
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast