Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessio Ignazio Marucchi

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1695Born
18 Sep 171823.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 174448.7AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
19 Apr 174448.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
13 May 175458.7DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessio Ignazio Marucchi
Bishop Alessio Ignazio Marucchi (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaluzzo

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 93
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast