Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Stella

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1682BornPalermo
24 Aug 170623.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Aug 170623.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 174259.5SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
9 Jul 174259.6ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
15 Jul 174259.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
7 Sep 175875.8DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Stella:
Bishop Giuseppe Stella (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015