Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Stella

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1619AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
29 Dec 1619Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
15 Dec 1621DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Stella
Bishop Giovanni Battista Stella (died ) Bishop of Bitonto

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 67, Number 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast