Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolň Spínola, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹Born
30 Jan 161734.1AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
24 Feb 161734.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
23 Sep 162239.7DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolň Spínola:
Bishop Nicolň Spínola C.R. (died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 363
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 62, Number 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014