Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Linati

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562BornParma
4 Dec 160644.9AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
13 Dec 160644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
24 Dec 160645.0InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
9 Oct 161957.8AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
3 Apr 162765.3DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Linati:
Bishop Giovanni Linati (died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 281, and Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 43, Number 231
  • ob/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013