Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guglielmo Cardinal Sanfelice D’Acquavella, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1834Born
15 Jul 185521.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Aug 185622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Mar 185722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 187844.2AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 Jul 187844.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Mar 188449.9Elevated to Cardinal
27 Mar 188449.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
3 Jan 189762.7DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Sanfelice D’Acquavella (VIAF: 89421625)
Guglielmo Cardinal Sanfelice D’Acquavella O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAversa, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Campitelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)Congregation of S. Maria in Vertecoeli Chapel, Pianto, Cemetery, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Current)Brancaccio chapel, Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,460
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 405, and Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1884
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017