Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fermín Sánchez Artesoro, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1784Born
25 Feb 180924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Apr 184964.3AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
6 May 184964.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
4 Dec 185571.0DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fermín Sánchez Artesoro
Bishop Fermín Sánchez Artesoro O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcaraz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gaeta, Diocese of Gaeta, Italy

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 158, Number 864
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast