Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François-Joseph Pisani de La Gaude

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1743BornAix
26 Oct 178340.6SelectedBishop of Vence, France
15 Dec 178340.7ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
8 Feb 178440.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
17 Oct 180158.6ResignedBishop of Vence, France
1 Mar 180460.9SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
28 May 180461.2ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
23 Feb 182682.9DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Charles-François-Joseph Pisani de La Gaude:
Bishop Charles-François-Joseph Pisani de La Gaude (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a bishop for 42.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016