Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Gallarati Scotti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1757BornMilano, Italy
22 Sep 178124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Feb 179436.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Feb 179436.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
27 Apr 179436.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
10 Jul 180446.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Gallarati Scotti:
Bishop Tommaso Gallarati Scotti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 22.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013