Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Edoardo Giuseppe Rosaz

Deceased

Bishop of Susa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1830Born
1 Apr 185424.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Susa, Italy
10 Jun 185424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Susa, Italy
31 Dec 187747.8AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
24 Feb 187848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
3 May 190373.2DiedBishop of Susa, Italy
14 Jul 1991Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Edoardo Giuseppe Rosaz (VIAF: 316421537)
Bishop Bl. Edoardo Giuseppe Rosaz (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSusa, Diocese of Susa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Susa, Diocese of Susa

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 508
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1878, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017