Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1648³Born
24 Mar 167425.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 168839.8AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
23 May 168839.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
21 Aug 168840.1DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Rosa
Bishop Bartolomeo Rosa (born , died ) Bishop of Lavello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuro Lucano

  • a priest for 14.4 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast