Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1883BornMontelungo
4 Apr 190825.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 194259.2AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
23 Aug 194259.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
3 Oct 197188.5DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Rosa:
Bishop Luigi Rosa (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,401
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015