Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Roissant

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Titular Bishop of Usula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1840Born
10 Jun 186525.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 190161.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
21 Mar 190161.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
15 Sep 190161.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
Aug 1909³69.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
6 Apr 191474.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Roissant
Bishop Jacques Roissant (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBommiers, France

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 576
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast