Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea de Rossi, C.R. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1689¹BornNapoli
1705¹16.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
7 Aug 174152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
26 Nov 174152.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea de Rossi:
Bishop Andrea de Rossi C.R. (born 1689) Titular Bishop of Patara

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015