Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María Rico y Santoyo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sonora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1831BornIrapuato
1 Apr 185423.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
23 Dec 185423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Aug 188352.5AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
21 Oct 188352.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
23 Feb 188453.1InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
11 Aug 188453.5DiedBishop of Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Jesús María Rico y Santoyo:
Bishop Jesús María Rico y Santoyo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sonora

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 524

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013