Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Retana Gozalo

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1953 Born
29 Sep 197926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ávila, Spain
9 Mar 201763.9AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
24 Jun 201764.2Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Luis Retana Gozalo (VIAF: 70817404)
Bishop José Luis Retana Gozalo (born ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedro Bernardo, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopPlasencia, Diocese of Plasencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Plasencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 17 Mar 2017
  • c2: CB, 19 Mar 2017
  • c34: CB, 21 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017