Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John O’Reilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1846Born
24 Jun 186922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
13 May 188740.5AppointedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
1 May 188841.4Ordained BishopBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
5 Jan 189548.1AppointedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
6 Jul 191568.6DiedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for John O’Reilly
Archbishop John O’Reilly (born , died ) Archbishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. John's, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Syndey, Archdiocese of Sydney

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75, and Page 465
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast